Royle, Mary-Clare Hogan (CPSO#: 79207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CF Health Services Centre Ottawa
101 Colonel by Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: (613) 945-1111
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary-Clare Royle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Fleury ( CPSO# 86118 )
Dr. M. Royle ( CPSO# 79207 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Psychiatry
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4581

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Business Address:
CF Health Services Centre Ottawa
101 Colonel by Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone Number: (613) 945-1111


Corporation Name: Dr. Gilles Fleury Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Fleury ( CPSO# 86118 )
Dr. M. Royle ( CPSO# 79207 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Room 3B115
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T3
Phone Number: (613) 761-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY-CLARE HOGAN ROYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROYLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008