Rozen, Dima (CPSO#: 89605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Jul 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit C8
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 398-1515
Fax: (416) 398-1516
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rozen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Krasnopolsky ( CPSO# 89677 )
Dr. D. Rozen ( CPSO# 89605 )

Business Address:
Champagne Centre
Unit C8
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 398-1515

Business Address:
Champagne Centre
Unit A4
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Krasnopolsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Krasnopolsky ( CPSO# 89677 )
Dr. D. Rozen ( CPSO# 89605 )

Business Address:
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 222-6160

Business Address:
Suite 100D
1111 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3T 2E5
Phone Number: (416) 736-6279

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Dima  Rozen  may  practice  medicine  independently  in  procedural  pain
            management and sedation, only.