Rozenblyum, Evelyn Victoria (CPSO#: 90635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Russian

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-360-4000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Rheumatology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-8137500
Fax: 4168134989
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Evelyn V. Rozenblyum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Rozenblyum ( CPSO# 90635 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Business Address:
Suite 201
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3

Business Address:
308 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2M2
Phone Number: (416) 745-3411

Business Address:
3910 Bathurst Street
North York ON  M3H 5Z3
Phone Number: (416) 636-2203

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVELYN VICTORIA ROZENBLYUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROZENBLYUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2013