Rubens, Fraser Douglas (CPSO#: 55799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Heart Institute
Room H3401A
40 Ruskin Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7290
Fax: (613) 696-7303
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fraser Rubens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Rubens ( CPSO# 55799 )
Dr. C. Dennie ( CPSO# 55436 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Room H3401A
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7290

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555


Corporation Name: Dr. Carole Dennie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Rubens ( CPSO# 55799 )
Dr. C. Dennie ( CPSO# 55436 )

Business Address:
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4164

Business Address:
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4164

Business Address:
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2B6
Phone Number: (613) 623-7720

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRASER DOUGLAS RUBENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Cardiothoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 7 - Cardiothoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1987