Ruberto, Aaron Jedediah (CPSO#: 100828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Dep. of Emergency Medicine
Dep. of Critical Care Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON JEDEDIAH RUBERTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBERTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018