Rudd, William Warren Hethrington (CPSO#: 17591)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 May 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1960
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 May 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 May 2018

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Aug 2018
Summary:

On August 10, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. William Warren Hethrington Rudd 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  
 
Dr. Rudd is a retired colorectal surgeon, who received his certificate of registration authorizing 
independent practice from the College in July 1960 and permanently retired from the practice of 
medicine on May 25, 2018. Prior to his retirement, Dr. Rudd practised in Toronto at an 
outpatient clinic where he performed anorectal surgery and colonoscopy.  
 
Patient A 
 
Patient A was first seen by Dr. Rudd in September 2013 for a complete anorectal examination 
which involved a sigmoidoscopy. She returned to see Dr. Rudd one year later, in September 
2014. At that appointment, Dr. Rudd performed a medically-indicated anorectal examination, 
including an anoscopy, which is less invasive than a sigmoidoscopy. When the examination was 
complete, Dr. Rudd did not take sufficient care to maintain Patient A’s privacy and spatial 
boundaries. This included touching one side of Patient A’s buttocks indicating the end of the 
examination, removing the paper drape and helping Patient A pull up her trousers. Dr. Rudd was 
accompanied by a nurse throughout the patient encounter.  
 
Patient A found the appointment distressing and continues to be affected by Dr. Rudd’s conduct. 
After the appointment, she expressed her concerns to her family doctor.  She did not return to see 
Dr. Rudd following her appointment.  
 
Patient B  
 
Patient B was seen by Dr. Rudd in November 2017 for an anorectal examination which involved 
an anoscopy and sigmoidoscopy. Patient B was diagnosed with an anal fissure.  On the way to 
the examination room, Dr. Rudd made an unprofessional comment to Patient B and another 
patient. During the course of the encounter, Dr. Rudd also made inappropriate comments about 
Patient B’s appearance and inquired about her personal life.  
 
During the appointment, Dr. Rudd did not obtain consent in an appropriate manner and did not 
take sufficient care to ensure privacy and appropriate coverage of Patient B. After his 
examination, Dr. Rudd instructed her on how to keep the affected area clean and dry and 
suggested certain treatments. As part of this process Dr. Rudd demonstrated proper ano-rectal 
self-care by placing his gloved hand on Patient B’s hands to guide her, without first ensuring she 
consented to him doing so. Dr. Rudd was accompanied by a nurse throughout the patient 
encounter.  
 
Patient B was distraught after the appointment and expressed her concerns to her husband and 
her family doctor. Patient B did not return to see Dr. Rudd following this appointment.  
 
 
 
Relevant College History 
 
In response to a public complaint from a patient, Dr. Rudd signed an undertaking to the College 
in 1992, which included the term that Dr. Rudd “must adopt/take all reasonable measures to 
continue to ensure to the extent practicable the comfort and dignity of his patients”. 
 
In January 1995, Dr. Rudd was cautioned by the Complaints Committee regarding sensitivity 
around assisting patients to pull up their undergarments and trousers following anorectal 
examinations. Dr. Rudd was directed to ask patients if they want help and, if so, to offer to have 
his nurse provide assistance.  
 
In March 2012, after reviewing materials from the investigation of a public complaint, the 
Inquiries Complaints and Reports Committee took no further action on the complaint. However, 
in its Decision and Reasons, the Committee indicated that, “…Dr. Rudd could probably have 
been a lot more sensitive in his communications with a young and anxious patient who was 
likely undergoing an anal/rectal examination with a scope for the first time. The Committee 
expects that Dr. Rudd will keep in mind the importance of sensitivity and patience in his 
communications in the future.”  
 
Undertaking to the College 
 
Dr. Rudd entered into an undertaking to the College on May 7, 2018, by which he agreed to 
resign his certificate of registration, effective May 25, 2018 
 
Disposition 
 
On August 10, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:  
 
   -  Dr. Rudd attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
   -  Dr. Rudd pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within thirty (30) days  of 
      the date of this Order.

Hearing Date(s): August 10, 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Willim Warren Hethrington Rudd to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 7, 2018:

Dr. Rudd was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to two patients and sexual abuse involving sexual comments with respect to one patient. After the allegations were referred to the Discipline Committee and prior to the hearing, Dr. Rudd resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. Prior to his resignation, Dr. Rudd will continue to ensure that a regulated health professional is present for the entire duration of every patient encounter.
Download Full Document (PDF)