Rudkowski, Jill Carole (CPSO#: 86067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Dept of General Internal Medicine
Suite F507
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35148
Fax: (905) 521-6068
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goffin Rudkowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rudkowski ( CPSO# 86067 )
Dr. J. Goffin ( CPSO# 69872 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Suite 3-15
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
Dept of General Internal Medicine
Suite F507
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 25 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILL CAROLE RUDKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUDKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2007 to 01 Jul 2007
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007