Rudnick, Abraham (CPSO#: 74070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6745
Fax: (807) 684-5892
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABRAHAM RUDNICK may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DIVISION OF CLINICAL SCIENCES, NORTHERN ONTARIO SCHOOL OF MEDICINE in which Dr. RUDNICK holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. RUDNICK may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. RUDNICK no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. RUDNICK no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. RUDNICK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2018