Ruengsakulrach, Permyos (CPSO#: 80146)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Prince of Songkla University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 24 Nov 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Nov 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2004