Ruggles, David James MacLeod (CPSO#: 72473)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
752 King St. West
Kimgston
Kingston ON  K7L4X3
Phone: (613) 544 4900 Ext. 53286
Fax: (613) 544-4614
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Ruggles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ruggles ( CPSO# 72473 )

Business Address:
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JAMES MACLEOD RUGGLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUGGLES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2008