Ruijs, Theodora Catharina Geziena (CPSO#: 70963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:State University of Utrecht, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratory Medicine
Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58719
Fax: (905) 494-6622
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Laboratory
Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
Phone: 888-941-4422
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 02 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THEODORA CATHARINA GEZIENA RUIJS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUIJS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 14 Jan 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jan 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1999