Rumman, Amir (CPSO#: 103067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Divison of Gastroenterology
R Fraser Elliott Building Rm 3 805
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 978-2645
Fax: (416) 978-7230
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIR RUMMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUMMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018