Runk, Joel Thomas (CPSO#: 95261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104C
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: (705) 326-4519
Fax: (705) 326-1534
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joel Runk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Runk ( CPSO# 95261 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Y8
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
104C - 119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 326-4519

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL THOMAS RUNK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUNK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013