Rusalovs'ka, Svitlana Vitaliyivna (CPSO#: 92614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Zaporozhye State Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 224
329 March Road
Kanata ON  K2K 2E1
Phone: (613) 592-1001
Fax: (613) 592-1026
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Rusalovs'ka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rusalovs'ka ( CPSO# 92614 )

Business Address:
Suite 224
329 March Road
Kanata ON  K2K 2E1
Phone Number: (613) 592-1001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SVITLANA VITALIYIVNA RUSALOVS'KA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSALOVS'KA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2010 to 31 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2012