Russell, Crispin John Carl (CPSO#: 90308)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
154 LeMarchant rd
Room SM 327
st. John's NL  A1C 5B8
Phone: (709) 777-5422
Fax: (709) 777-5849

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRISPIN JOHN CARL RUSSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 30 Mar 2009 to 26 Apr 2009
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Apr 2009 to 22 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011