Russell, Grant Mervyn (CPSO#: 74665)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Western Australia, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Aug 2001 to 30 Apr 2002
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2009