Russell, Jennifer Louise (CPSO#: 72415)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Room 1725
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7291
Fax: (416) 813-7547
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LOUISE RUSSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2001