Russell, John David (CPSO#: 51541)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healtcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Address: St Josephs Hospital 50 Charlton Avenue East Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Date Received: 17 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 08 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DAVID RUSSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - General Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - General Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - General Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - General Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Mar 1989
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2018