Russell, Neville Anderson (CPSO#: 20578)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 15 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Apr 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jan 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010