Russell, Vincent Robert Michael (CPSO#: 56467)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: ERC Building 1st Floor RCSI Beaumont Dublin 9, Ireland
Date Received: 30 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018