Rustad, Jennifer Anne (CPSO#: 89016)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

201-343 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3H 1T1
Canada
Phone: 416 636-3237
Fax: 416 636-3236
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Feb 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANNE RUSTAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSTAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 16 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2011