Ruzhynsky, Jennifer Lynn (CPSO#: 95875)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vladimir Ruzhynsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2017

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 08 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 08 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 03 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 2017