Ruzickova, Martina (CPSO#: 94210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mood Disorders Services
Dalhousie University
5909 Veterans' Memorial Lane
Abbie J. Lane Building
Halifax NS  B3H 2E2
Phone: 902 473 2585
Fax: 902 473 4877

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Nov 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTINA RUZICKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUZICKOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 12 Oct 2010
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2014