Ryan, Christopher Gerard (CPSO#: 88704)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Western University
Student Health Services
University Community Centre Room 11
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3030
Fax: (519) 661-3380
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher G. Ryan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ryan ( CPSO# 88704 )

Business Address:
Western University
Student Health Services
University Community Centre, Room 11
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3030

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER GERARD RYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2014