Ryan, Dale Thomas (CPSO#: 71141)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto South Detention Centre
160 Horner Ave
Toronto ON  M8Z 0C2
Phone: (416) 354-4030 Ext. 3030
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Belluzzo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 17 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALE THOMAS RYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002