Ryan, Kenneth Francis (CPSO#: 84472)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011