Rybak, Iouri Efremovitch (CPSO#: 79334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Petrozavodsk State University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
Mood and Anxiety disorders program
550 Wellington Rd.
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 47365
Fax: (519) 452-4391
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IOURI EFREMOVITCH RYBAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYBAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 19 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2005 to 11 Mar 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Mar 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2010