Rycroft, Jennifer Elizabeth (CPSO#: 95335)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Beamsville Medical Centre
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Phone: (905) 563-5315
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Rycroft Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rycroft ( CPSO# 95335 )

Business Address:
Beamsville Medical Centre
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Phone Number: (905) 563-5315

Business Address:
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 5J5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Nov 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ELIZABETH RYCROFT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYCROFT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 06 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2014