Ryding, Sarah Louise (CPSO#: 67739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 506
2039 Robertson Rd.
Ottawa ON  K2H 8R2
Phone: (613) 596-5888
Fax: (613) 596-3254
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 2860
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryding & Gay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ryding ( CPSO# 67739 )
Dr. R. Gay ( CPSO# 66661 )

Business Address:
506 - 2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8R2
Phone Number: (613) 596-5888

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (905) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH LOUISE RYDING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYDING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2000