Rydz, Frederick (CPSO#: 96053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3080 Prince Edward St
Vancouver BC  V5T 3N4
Phone: (778) 788-6979

Medical Records Location

Address: Western University Hospital 800 Comissioners Road East London, ON N6A 5W9
Instructions: St Thomas Elgin Hospital 189 Elm Street St Thomas, ON N5R 5C4
Date Received: 30 Jul 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERICK RYDZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYDZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History