Rydzik, Marie Suzanne (CPSO#: 43497)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
333 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1S 5N4
Phone: (613) 235-8079
Fax: (613) 235-5421
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 21 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 21 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 21, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Marie Suzanne Rydzik
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Forbath to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                       DR. MARIE SUZANNE RYDZIK
                                            ("Dr. Rydzik")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  "All other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                  and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, as noted in
                  Schedule "C".
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Rydzik, certificate of registration number 43497, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that the College initiated investigations
                  bearing File Number 7216514 and File Number 104956 (the "Investigations")
                  into whether I failed to maintain the standard of practice of the
                  profession and/or am incompetent in my prescribing of controlled
                  substances, including narcotics.

            (4)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that I was subject to an order dated September
                  21, 2017 made by the ICR Committee pursuant to s. 25.4 of the Code (the
                  "Section 25.4 Order") and that this Undertaking supercedes the Section
                  25.4 Order as of the Effective Date.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking
                  effective upon the date I sign it (the "Effective Date").

            (6)   I, Dr. Rydzik, shall keep a Log of all prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs,
                  Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the form attached
                  as set out in Schedule "D", which will 
                  include at least the following information (the "Prescribing Log"):  
                  
                  (i)   the date of the appointment;
                  (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                  (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction, number of
                        tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                  (iv)  the clinical indication;
                  (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or different
                        dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the patient (Y/N); 
                  (vi)  Dr. Rydzik's signature;
                  (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable, as set
                        out below); and
                  (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set out
                        below).
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for
                  Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                  and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the
                  corresponding patient chart.

            (8)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of nine (9) months on the terms set
                        out below (the "Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge and undertake that each phase of
                        Clinical Supervision set out below will only be reduced upon
                        recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval by the
                        College.
                  
            Phase 1 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 1")

                  (c)   I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake to engage in Phase 1 of Clinical
                        Supervision for a minimum of two (2) months on the terms set out
                        below.
                  
                  (d)   During Phase 1, I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every week to discuss the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                  i.    20 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic Drugs,
                        Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                        Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs since the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review, or if since the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s prior review there are not 20 patients listed in
                        the Prescribing Log to whom I have prescribed Narcotic Drugs,
                        Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                        Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs , then the charts
                        of all patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical
                        Supervisor's prior review; and
                  
                  ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated a new
                        prescription for:
                  
                              1.Narcotic Drugs, or
                              2.Narcotic Preparations; or
                              3.Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                              Substances and All other Monitored Drugs where the patient is
                              also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or Narcotic Preparation,
                              or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review there
                              are not 10 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I
                              have initiated a new prescription for Narcotic Drugs,
                              Narcotic Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                              and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                              where the patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                              Narcotic Preparation, then the charts of all patients listed
                              in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior
                              review.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every two (2) weeks.
                  (g)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that after a minimum of two (2) months
                        of Phase 1, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have
                        the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice in a less
                        highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        recommend to the College that supervision be reduced. 
                  
            Phase 2 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 2")

                  (h)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake to engage in Phase 2 of
                        Clinical Supervision for a minimum of four (4) months on the terms
                        set out below.
                  
                  (i)   During Phase 2, I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every two (2) weeks to discuss the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                        
                        i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review
                              there are not 15 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to
                              whom I have prescribed Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                              Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                              Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, then the charts of
                              all patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical
                              Supervisor's prior review; and
                        ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated a new
                              prescription for:
                                    1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                                    2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                                    3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                                          Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                                          where the patient is also prescribed a Narcotic
                                          Drug and/or Narcotic Preparation,
                              or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review there
                              are not 10 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I
                              have initiated a new prescription for Narcotic Drugs,
                              Narcotic Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                              and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                              where the patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                              Narcotic Preparation, then the charts of all patients listed
                              in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior
                              review. 
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every two (2) weeks.
                  
                  (l)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that after a minimum of four (4) months
                        of Phase 2, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have
                        the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice in a less
                        highly supervised environment, the Clinical
                         Supervisor(s) may recommend to the College that supervision be
                        reduced.
                  
            Phase 3 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 3")

                  (m)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake to engage in Phase 3 of
                        Clinical Supervision for a minimum of three (3) months on the terms
                        set out below.
                  
                  (n)   During Phase 3, I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every month to discuss the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                        i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review
                              there are not 15 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to
                              whom I have prescribed Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                              Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                              Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, then the charts of
                              all patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical
                              Supervisor's prior review; and
                        ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated a new
                              prescription for:
                                    1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                                    2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                                    3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                                          Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                                          where the patient is also prescribed a Narcotic
                                          Drug and/or Narcotic Preparation,
                                          or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                                          review there are not 10 patients listed in the
                                          Prescribing Log to whom I have initiated a new
                                          prescription for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                                          Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                                          and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                                          Monitored Drugs where the patient is also
                                          prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or Narcotic
                                          Preparation, then the charts of all patients
                                          listed in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical
                                          Supervisor's prior review. 
                  
                  (o)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that during Phase 3, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed with me.
                  
                  (p)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that during Phase 3, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every month.
                  
                  (q)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that after a minimum of three (3) months
                        of Phase 3, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have
                        the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice without
                        supervision, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may recommend to the
                        College that the Clinical Supervision cease. 
                  
                  (r)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge and undertake that the Clinical
                        Supervision will only cease upon recommendation of the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) and approval by the College.
                  
                  (s)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  In
                        addition to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will,
                        at a minimum: 
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Schedule
                              "F";
                        (ii)  Discuss any concerns with me arising from chart reviews and
                              observations;
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; and
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision.
                  
                  (t)   I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake that all meetings with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will take place at my Practice Location, or another
                        Location approved by the College;
                  
                  (u)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that all charts reviewed shall be
                        independently selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the
                        educational needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "F" to
                        my Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        reports of the expert opinion provider dated September 30, 2017,
                        December 20, 2017, March 20, 2018 and April 27, 2018 and concerns
                        that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (v)   I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "E" attached, and to abide by the
                        reasonable recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including
                        but not limited to, any reasonable recommended practice
                        improvements and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (w)   I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake to ensure that Schedule "E" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within fourteen
                        (14) days of the Effective Date.
                  (x)   I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "E" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        fourteen (14) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (y)   I, Dr. Rydzik, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the terms set out in sections (8)(w) and/or (x)
                        above, I will cease prescribing Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                        Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                        Substances and All other Monitored Drugs until such time as I have
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (z)   I, Dr. Rydzik, agree that if I am required to cease prescribing
                        Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                        Monitored Drugs as a result of section (8)(y) above this will
                        constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                        registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                        included on the Public Register.
                  
            (9)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   In the course of this investigation, I, Dr. Rydzik, enrolled in and
                        completed the three webinars of the University of Toronto Faculty
                        of Medicine program in Safe Opioid Prescribing:
                        www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all elements of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Schedule "F", including but not limited to, the following elements
                        of professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   The in-person workshop component of the University of Toronto
                              Faculty of Medicine program in Safe Opioid Prescribing:
                              www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                        (ii)  University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Medical
                              Record-Keeping:  http://www.cpd.utoronto.ca/recordkeeping/;
                        (iii) CMPA e-learning programs "Documentation: Charting Medical
                              Records eLearning Module" and "Documentation II: Principles
                              of Medical Recordkeeping eLearning Module";
                        (iv)  Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the
                              following resources:
                  
                              1.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain:
                                    http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/guidelines.html;
                              2.    CMPA advice regarding preventing the misuse of opioids
                                    https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/en/advice-publications/browse-articles/2015/preventing-the-misuse-of-opioids;
                  
                              3.    The Centre for Effective Practice Management of Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain Tool https://thewellhealth.ca/cncp;
                  (v)   Review and prepare a written summary of up to 2000 words on each of
                        the following CPSO Policies, which summaries shall be submitted to
                        and discussed with my Clinical Supervisor(s):
                  
                        1.    Narcotics and Controlled Substances section of the CPSO
                              Policy "Prescribing Drugs":
                              http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs;
                              and
                        2.    the CPSO Policy "Medical Records": 
                              
                              http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Medical-Records;
                              and
                  (vi)  any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of each element of the Professional Education
                        specified above, including proof of registration, attendance and
                        participant assessment reports where available, within one (1)
                        month of completion of each element. I acknowledge that the College
                        will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                        completed each element of the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (10)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake that, approximately nine (9) months after
                        the Clinical Supervision set out under section 8 of the Undertaking
                        has ceased, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Reassessment").
                  
                   (b)  I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may
                        include a chart review, direct observation of my care, an interview
                        of me, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under the terms of this Undertaking 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and that the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (11)  Monitoring 
                  
                        (a)   I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake to inform the College of each and
                              every Location at which I practise or have privileges,
                              including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and
                              office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice
                              Location(s)"), within ten (10) business days of executing
                              this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to
                              inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations
                              within ten (10) business days of commencing practice at that
                              Location.
                  
                        (b)   I, Dr. Rydzik, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and
                              not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice
                              Location(s) and patient records by a College representative
                              for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the
                              provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                        (c)   I, Dr. Rydzik, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                              make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance
                              Plan ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the
                              Narcotics Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the
                              Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or
                              institution who may have relevant information, in order for
                              the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of
                              this Undertaking. 
                  
                        (d)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and
                              NMS consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "G" and
                              Schedule "H", respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

                  (12)  I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or
                        referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (13)  I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                        payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from
                        the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (14)  I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and
                        understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have
                        obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                        Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
                  
                  (15)  I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                        Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                        responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").
                  (16)  I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                        this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct
                        and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified
                        allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.
                  
                  (17)  I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                        terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of
                        registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 
                  
            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rydzik, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with the section above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College received information about Dr. Rydzik's
                              prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics,
                              and conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Rydzik failed
                              to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or
                              was incompetent in her prescribing.  As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Rydzik's prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic
                                    preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and
                                    other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs
                                    will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable
                                    to the College for minimum of nine (9) months. 
                  
                                    Dr. Rydzik will engage in professional education in the
                                    prescribing of controlled substances, including
                                    narcotics.
                  
                                    Following the professional education and period of
                                    supervision, Dr. Rydzik's prescribing of controlled
                                    substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by
                                    an assessor selected by the College.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Rydzik, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                        (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances
                              of my 
                              entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                        (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or
                              assessment of, my practice; and 
                  
                        (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance
                              with this Undertaking.
                  
            (20)  I, Dr. Rydzik, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Rydzik, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                        (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                        (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's
                              undertaking set out at Schedule "E";
                  
                        (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                        (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with
                              this Undertaking; and/or 
                  
                        (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of
                              providing the Professional Education and which he or she
                              reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                              patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 21, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Marie Suzanne Rydzik to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 21, 2018:

The College received information about Dr. Rydzik’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, and conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Rydzik failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in her prescribing. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Rydzik’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for minimum of nine (9) months.

Dr. Rydzik will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Rydzik’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.