Ryglewicz, Borys Jan (CPSO#: 94478)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 979-7878
Fax: (519) 979-7872
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. and K. Ryglewicz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ryglewicz ( CPSO# 85718 )
Dr. B. Ryglewicz ( CPSO# 94478 )

Business Address:
201 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 979-7878

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Mar 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BORYS JAN RYGLEWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYGLEWICZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2013