Gaytan-Garcia Graham, Silvia Raquel Margarita (CPSO#: 60547)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4779
Fax: (705) 675-4780
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bonin and Queen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ngae ( CPSO# 94283 )
Dr. B. Mitrovic ( CPSO# 91572 )
Dr. J. Gonzalez Berjon ( CPSO# 102034)
Dr. L. Widjanarko ( CPSO# 51679 )
Dr. A. Tomczak-Bojarski ( CPSO# 73304 )
Dr. M. Rutherford ( CPSO# 67926 )
Dr. M. Queen ( CPSO# 51719 )
Dr. R. McClure ( CPSO# 101763)
Dr. S. Gaytan-Garcia Graham ( CPSO# 60547 )
Dr. D. Bonin ( CPSO# 58373 )
Dr. B. Danielson ( CPSO# 93246 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100


Corporation Name: Dr. Silvia Gaytan-Garcia Graham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gaytan-Garcia Graham ( CPSO# 60547 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 07 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 29 May 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SILVIA RAQUEL MARGARITA GAYTAN-GARCIA GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAYTAN-GARCIA GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Jul 1992
Resident 4 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1999