Thomson, Scott Matthew (CPSO#: 57552)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: (519) 376-3954
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Scott Thomson, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thomson ( CPSO# 57552 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Diagnostic Imaging Department
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
Owen Sound Medical Centre
Suite 3600
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2000


Corporation Name: Dr.'s Thomson, Howlett, Hawkes, Rosta, Saab, Baldauf, Greaves & McIver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Drover ( CPSO# 82776 )
Dr. S. Thomson ( CPSO# 57552 )
Dr. G. Saab ( CPSO# 81104 )
Dr. N. Rosta ( CPSO# 67897 )
Dr. C. McIver ( CPSO# 31778 )
Dr. L. Howlett ( CPSO# 68288 )
Dr. R. Hawkes ( CPSO# 77933 )
Dr. F. Greaves ( CPSO# 31954 )
Dr. C. Baldauf ( CPSO# 72518 )

Business Address:
Owen Sound Medical Centre
Suite 3600
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 376-2000

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT MATTHEW THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1986