Sa, Ah Young Grace (CPSO#: 89116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
246 Dundas Street South Unit 3
Cambridge ON  N1R 8A8
Phone: (519) 267-7388
Fax: 844-453-3558
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark J. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 77748 )
Dr. A. Sa ( CPSO# 89116 )

Business Address:
201-745 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 0B6
Phone Number: (519) 624-8589

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 650-2777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AH YOUNG GRACE SA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010