Saad, Amany Ibrahim Mohamed (CPSO#: 96786)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 17 Nov 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Nov 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2016 to 26 Apr 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Apr 2016