Saad, George (CPSO#: 93455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 2C6
Electoral District: 08

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE SAAD shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SAAD is enrolled at NORTHERN ONTARIO SCHOOL OF MEDICINE;

(2) Dr. SAAD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SAAD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SAAD shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SAAD is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SAAD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 29 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 25 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 31 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018