Saari, Kendra Ann (CPSO#: 93515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chapleau & District
Family Health Team
2 Broomhead Road
Chapleau ON  P0M 1K0
Phone: (705) 864-0210
Fax: (705) 864-0149
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chapleau General Hospital
6 Broomhead Road
Chapleau, Ontario
Chapleau ON  P0M 1K0
Canada
Phone: 705-864-3060
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kendra A. Saari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Saari ( CPSO# 93515 )

Business Address:
Chapleau & District
Family Health Team
2 Broomhead Road
Chapleau ON  P0M 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 864-0210

Business Address:
6 Broomhead Road
Chapleau ON  P0M 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 864-1520

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chapleau Health Services,Chapleau General Hospital Chapleau

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENDRA ANN SAARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012