Sabapathy, Christine Anishia (CPSO#: 92414)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2010 to 07 Mar 2010
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 27 Sep 2010 to 24 Oct 2010
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2013