Sabbagh, Robert (CPSO#: 82047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Sherbrooke
Division of Urology
Faculty of Medicine
3001 12E Avenue Nord
Sherbrooke QC  J1H 5N4
Phone: (819) 346-1110 Ext. 74595
Fax: (819) 820-6411

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 11 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT SABBAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABBAGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2005