Sabbagh, Roland (CPSO#: 84050)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
570 Lacolle Way
Asclepios Cardiology Clinic
Orleans ON  K4A 0N9
Phone: (613) 830-8388 Ext. 322
Fax: (613) 778-8655
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
Department of Cardiology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4634
Fax: (613) 748-4975
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roland Sabbagh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sabbagh ( CPSO# 84050 )

Business Address:
570 Lacolle Way
Ottawa ON  K4A 0N9
Phone Number: (613) 830-8388

Business Address:
Department of Internal Medicine
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro 1B-700 Industrial Avenue Ottawa, ON K1G 0Y9 Tel: (613) 738-1242 Fax: (613) 738-0562
Date Received: 24 Aug 2011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROLAND SABBAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABBAGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2006