Saber Hamishegi, Helaleh (CPSO#: 89435)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Nov 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5925 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2M 3V7
Phone: (416) 222-2331
Fax: (416) 222-2394
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helaleh Saber Hamishegi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Saber Hamishegi ( CPSO# 89435 )

Business Address:
5925 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2M 3V7
Phone Number: (416) 222-2331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELALEH SABER HAMISHEGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABER HAMISHEGI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 22 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2015