Sabga, Edward Anthony (CPSO#: 62166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
705 Concession 2 North
Amherstburg ON  N9V 3R3
Phone: 5195517940
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Sabga Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sabga ( CPSO# 62166 )

Business Address:
705 Concession 2 North
Amherstburg ON  N9V 3R3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD ANTHONY SABGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABGA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991