Sabourin, Jeanelle Nicole (CPSO#: 92470)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 Feb 2010 to 07 Mar 2010
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 07 Feb 2011 to 04 Mar 2011
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Mar 2011