Sabry, James Henderson (CPSO#: 52991)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Building 33 Genentech 330 DNA Way South San Francisco California 94080 United States
Date Received: 03 Apr 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 25 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018