Sachdeva, Ashok (CPSO#: 93001)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Maharshi Dayanand University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RIDGEWAY CLINIC
Suite 1
1001 RIDGEWAY STREET EAST
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 5H8
Phone: (807) 622-0601
Fax: (807) 623 0470
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ridgeway Walk in Medical Clinic
1001 Ridgeway Street East
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 5H8
Canada
Phone: (807) 622-0601
Fax: (807) 623-0470
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashok Sachdeva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sachdeva ( CPSO# 93001 )

Business Address:
Golf Links Community Clinic
Unit 1
1077 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A3
Phone Number: (807) 622-3995

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHOK SACHDEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACHDEVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012