Sacheli, Aaron Joseph (CPSO#: 108053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orangeville Family Medical Centre
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth St
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone: (519) 938-8000
Fax: (519) 938-8080
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON JOSEPH SACHELI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACHELI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2015 to 12 Jan 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 19 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2018