Sacksen, Alain Joseph Benoit (CPSO#: 76303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Essa Road Medical Clinic
21 Essa Road
Barrie ON  L4N 3K4
Phone: (705) 728-5433
Fax: (705) 725-9360
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sacksen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sacksen ( CPSO# 76303 )

Business Address:
21 Essa Road
Barrie ON  L4N 3K4
Phone Number: (705) 739-8989

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAIN JOSEPH BENOIT SACKSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACKSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2003