Sadana, Sumeet (CPSO#: 78072)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Capital KidZ Medical Centre
737 Silver Seven Road
Unit 5
Ottawa ON  K2V 0H3
Phone: (613) 828-3122
Fax: (613) 828-2010
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sumeet Sadana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sadana ( CPSO# 78072 )

Business Address:
LifeSource Medical Centre
2130 Robertson Road
Nepean ON  K2H 5Z1
Phone Number: (613) 828-3122

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUMEET SADANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006