Sadashiva, Ramya (CPSO#: 95547)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Mysore University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ramya Sadashiva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Medmart Medical Centre 54 King Street East Stoney Creek ON L8G 1K2
Date Received: 22 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2017